Մաթեմատիկա

Մաթեմատիկա

Վարժ.328

38×275+38×25=11400

103×87+103×29=2987

66×432+66×97=34914

73×205+73×56=19053

 

Վարժ.330

5×2+5×3=25

4×3+3×4=24

4×8+4×7=60

3×6+3×6=36

 

Վարժ.354

5-5

6-4

7-3

9-8

 

Վարժ.357

6804+4467=11271

5437+2411=7848

71237+29965=101200

16394+30781=47175

3763+9999=3762

 

Վարժ.360

Լուծում

1)30×6=180էջ

2)180+18=198էջ

Պատ՝198էջ

 

Վարժ.362

?

 

Վարժ.364

1)65-41=24տ.

2)16+24=40տ.

 

Պատ՝40տ.

 

 

Advertisements

Թողնել պատասխան

Fill in your details below or click an icon to log in:

WordPress.com Logo

You are commenting using your WordPress.com account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Google+ photo

You are commenting using your Google+ account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Twitter picture

You are commenting using your Twitter account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Facebook photo

You are commenting using your Facebook account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Connecting to %s