Մաթեմատիկա, Uncategorized

Մթեմատիկա

Վարժ․523

48×25=1200
1200:12=100
48:12=4
4×25=100

 

Վարժ․524

Պատ․՝չի գործի

Վարժ․525

(18+27):3=15
(16+28):4=11
(3×25):5=15
(18×132):6=396
(39×1205):13=361
(48×5327):16=15981

 

Վարժ․526

10:2=5
10×2:2=10

Պատ․՝Քանորդը երկու անգամ կմեծանա

Վարժ․532

734172-779:19+795×23=752416
309824:376+96514:902=931
488865:897-191875:625=238

Վարժ․553

19:8=2 մն 3
21:8=2  մն 5
33:8=4  մն 1

Advertisements

Թողնել պատասխան

Fill in your details below or click an icon to log in:

WordPress.com Logo

You are commenting using your WordPress.com account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Google+ photo

You are commenting using your Google+ account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Twitter picture

You are commenting using your Twitter account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Facebook photo

You are commenting using your Facebook account. Log Out /  Փոխել )

Connecting to %s